U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00338-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burge
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 05, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • August 05, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Sent]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • August 05, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • August 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
  • July 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.