U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02129
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Branstutter
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 17, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Remark]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 25, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.