U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 25, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.