U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03244
  • Case Name: Watson et al v. Hardee et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 08, 2022: [Response to Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice-other]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 25, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.