U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Magill, III
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Dismiss ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Appearance Bond of Witness ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 25, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.