U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02130
  • Case Name: Almendarez v. United States et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • December 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 05, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.