U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03246
  • Case Name: Duty v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.