U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03245
  • Case Name: Blakney v. Hartsville S.C. Police Dept.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2022: [Entry of Default]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2022: [Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • October 12, 2022: [Document]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • September 27, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • September 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • September 13, 2022: [Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 07, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • August 31, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 30, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 24, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 19, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 15, 2022: [Declaration]
  • August 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 15, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.