U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03252
  • Case Name: Clark v. Simpson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Document]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 03, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 02, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 27, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.