U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03251
  • Case Name: Beltran v. Trant et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 11, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 11, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.