U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03250
  • Case Name: Spencer v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • November 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.