U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03249
  • Case Name: Jones v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 12, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 08, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.