U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03248
  • Case Name: Lane v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 05, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 04, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 03, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 05, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 10, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.