U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fisher
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.