U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03255
  • Case Name: Hardin v. Everett et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 03, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 02, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 28, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.