U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03254
  • Case Name: Creech v. Simmons et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Summons Reissued]
  • January 24, 2023: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 22, 2022: [Text Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice-other]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 23, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 18, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.