U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03272
  • Case Name: Al-Hanif El v. Cooper et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 09, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • October 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 12, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Reopening Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Case Submitted]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.