U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01696-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perscell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 02, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 23, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.