U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03290
  • Case Name: Spaulding v. United States District Court
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 20, 2023: [USCA Order]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • November 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 10, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Document]
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Document]
  • August 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 03, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 02, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 28, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.