U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • August 30, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 29, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.