U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00326-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barrera, Jr, et. al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • August 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 28, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.