U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00295-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RIVERA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • August 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Preliminary Exam (Hearing) and Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 16, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 16, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Arrest]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.