U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00021
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $15,046.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • August 17, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • August 17, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.