U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03292
  • Case Name: Nichols v. Strickland
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 16, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 16, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 01, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.