U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03291
  • Case Name: Hunter v. Warden et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 15, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 15, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 02, 2022: [Writ of Mandamus]
  • August 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 01, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.