U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02135
  • Case Name: Hunter v. Warden of Central Prison
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 04, 2023: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 02, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.