U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02136
  • Case Name: Stripling v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 20, 2023: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Document]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 02, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.