U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barfield
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Bond ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 02, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.