U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03294
  • Case Name: Evans v. Slagle et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 17, 2023: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 01, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2022: [Declaration]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Default]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 19, 2022: [Entry of Default]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 02, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.