U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02137
  • Case Name: Lancaster v. Millis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 09, 2023: [Document]
  • January 09, 2023: [Response]
  • January 09, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 21, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • December 21, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 21, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 15, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 03, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 03, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 03, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 03, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.