U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Midgett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 04, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.