U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mc-00014
  • Case Name: Ever-Seal, Inc. v. Halferty
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 09, 2023: [Remark]
  • January 09, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 09, 2023: [Withdraw Reference]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 04, 2022: [Withdraw Reference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.