U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03054
  • Case Name: Bethea v. Atkinson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Response]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • October 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.