U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03301
  • Case Name: Friday v. Jones
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 17, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 17, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 16, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 15, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.