U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03302
  • Case Name: Gause v. Howell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 08, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 05, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.