U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01712-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pfeffer
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • January 05, 2023: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.