U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01710-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 25, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • August 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 06, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.