U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01709-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 14, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
August, 2022
  • August 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 06, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • August 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.