U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01728-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pellot
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.