U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01717-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vanderhall
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 06, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
August, 2022
  • August 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • August 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.