U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01714-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • October 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • August 10, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 10, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • August 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • August 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.