U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-md-03036
  • Case Name: In Re: Gardasil Products Liability Litigation
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Case Number - Court of Appeals]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memorandum/Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sealed Document]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • January 06, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 28, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 02, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 02, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 26, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 08, 2022: [MDL Transfer Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.