U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01746-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rocha
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 18, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • November 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.