U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01744-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Porter
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.