U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02141
  • Case Name: Brown v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • January 17, 2023: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • January 17, 2023: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Submitted]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.