U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hatfield
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 11, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.