U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02140
  • Case Name: Gonzalez v. King et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • December 15, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • December 15, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 27, 2022: [Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.