U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03305
  • Case Name: Seawright v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 15, 2022: [Document]
  • September 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Declaration]
  • August 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.