U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00374-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Rule 5 Bond Release]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2022: [Bond]
  • October 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 12, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Sent]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Rule 5 Bond Release]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2022: [Bond]
  • August 12, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.