U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mc-00016
  • Case Name: Utah Products, Inc. et al v. Aiping Hu
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 24, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 13, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 12, 2022: [Declaration]
  • August 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 12, 2022: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.